PNC Bank, Kentucky, Inc.

Kentucky – Jefferson – Louisville

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

10513

1858

FDIC Certificate Number: 10513
FDIC's unique number: 6731
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Elizabethtown

Federal Reserve ID Number: 940348
Report Date: 1997-09-30

Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 1998-01-08

1858-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Citizens Fidelity Bank And Trust Company.
1991-08-30 Acquired Future Federal Savings Bank in Louisville, Kentucky.
1992-01-01 Acquired Citizens Fidelity Bank And Trust Company Lexington in Lexington, Kentucky.
1992-06-19 Acquired Citizens Fidelity Bank And Trust Company Hardin County in Elizabethtown, Kentucky.
1992-08-21 Acquired Citizens Fidelity Bank And Trust Company Oldham County in La Grange, Kentucky.
1993-02-08 Changed name to Pnc Bank, Kentucky, Inc. .
1997-12-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of PNC Bank, National Association in Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania.
2000-04-07 Moved bank headquarters from Louisville, Kentucky to Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania.
2000-11-30 Acquired Pnc Converted Bank, National Association in Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania.
2001-03-31 Acquired Pnc Advisors, National Association in Boston, Massachusetts.
2001-09-30 Acquired Hilliard Lyons Trust Company in Louisville, Kentucky.
2004-03-19 Acquired United Trust Bank in Bridgewater, New Jersey.
2005-05-13 Acquired Riggs National Trust Company in Mclean, Virginia.
2007-09-14 Acquired Farmers & Mechanics Bank in Frederick, Maryland.
2007-09-14 Acquired The Citizens National Bank in Laurel, Maryland.
2007-09-14 Acquired Mercantile Eastern Shore Bank in Chestertown, Maryland.
2007-09-14 Acquired The National Bank Of Fredericksburg in Fredericksburg, Virginia.
2007-09-14 Acquired Marshall National Bank And Trust Company in Marshall, Virginia.
2007-09-14 Acquired Mercantile Peninsula Bank in Selbyville, Delaware.
2007-09-14 Acquired The Annapolis Banking And Trust Company in Annapolis, Maryland.
2007-09-14 Acquired Westminster Union Bank in Westminster, Maryland.
2007-09-14 Acquired Mercantile County Bank in Elkton, Maryland.
2007-09-14 Acquired Mercantile Southern Maryland Bank in Leonardtown, Maryland.
2007-09-14 Acquired Mercantile-safe Deposit And Trust Company in Baltimore, Maryland.
2008-03-07 Acquired The Yardville National Bank in Yardville, New Jersey.
2008-08-08 Acquired Blc Bank N. A. in Strasburg, Pennsylvania.
2009-08-14 Acquired Dwelling House Savings And Loan Association in Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-08-21 Moved bank headquarters from Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania to Wilmington, Delaware.
2009-08-21 Acquired Pnc Bank, Delaware in Wilmington, Delaware.
2009-11-06 Acquired National City Bank in Cleveland, Ohio.

Total assets: $4,877,290,000
Total deposits: $3,386,186,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

PNC Bank, Kentucky, Inc. does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with PNC Bank, Kentucky, Inc., we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and PNC Bank, Kentucky, Inc. will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-408

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.