PNC Bank, National Association

Pennsylvania – Allegheny – Pittsburgh

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

7944

1864

FDIC Certificate Number: 7944
FDIC's unique number: 5079
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Wexford

Federal Reserve ID Number: 817824
Report Date: 1996-06-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 252
The date of the last data update: 1998-04-11

1864-02-13 Institution established. Original name: Pittsburgh National Bank.
1973-03-05 Moved bank headquarters from Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania to Jeannette, Pennsylvania.
1973-10-26 Acquired Farmers' Bank & Trust Company Of Indiana, Pa. in Indiana, Pennsylvania.
1974-11-15 Acquired Blairsville National Bank in Blairsville, Pennsylvania.
1975-08-08 Acquired The Second National Bank Of Connellsville in Connellsville, Pennsylvania.
1982-12-10 Acquired The County Trust Company in Somerset, Pennsylvania.
1984-10-15 Moved bank headquarters from Jeannette, Pennsylvania to Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania.
1986-12-31 Acquired The Bridgeville Trust Company in Bridgeville, Pennsylvania.
1991-01-04 Acquired First Federal Savings And Loan Association Of Pittsburgh in Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania.
1993-02-04 Acquired Provident National Bank in Bryn Mawr, Pennsylvania.
1993-02-04 Changed name to Pnc Bank, National Association .
1993-04-23 Acquired Marine Bank in Warren, Pennsylvania.
1993-06-26 Acquired Pnc Bank, Northeast Pa in Wilkes-barre, Pennsylvania.
1993-08-06 Acquired The First Bank And Trust Company Of Mechanicsburg, Pa. in Mechanicsburg, Pennsylvania.
1993-08-06 Acquired The Hershey Bank in Hershey, Pennsylvania.
1993-08-06 Acquired Ccnb Bank, National Association in Camp Hill, Pennsylvania.
1994-01-21 Acquired United Federal Savings Bank in State College, Pennsylvania.
1994-06-17 Acquired First Eastern Bank, National Association in Wilkes-barre, Pennsylvania.
1995-10-06 Acquired Pnc Bank, New Jersey, National Association in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania.
1996-09-06 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of PNC Bank, National Association in Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania.
1997-11-30 Acquired Pnc Mortgage Bank, National Association in Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania.
1997-12-01 Acquired Pnc Bank New York, National Association in Warren, Pennsylvania.
1997-12-31 Acquired Pnc Bank, Ohio, National Association in Cincinnati, Ohio.
1997-12-31 Acquired Pnc Bank, Kentucky, Inc. in Louisville, Kentucky.
1997-12-31 Acquired P N C Bank, Indiana, Inc. in New Albany, Indiana.
2000-11-30 Acquired Pnc Converted Bank, National Association in Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania.
2001-03-31 Acquired Pnc Advisors, National Association in Boston, Massachusetts.
2001-09-30 Acquired Hilliard Lyons Trust Company in Louisville, Kentucky.
2004-03-19 Acquired United Trust Bank in Bridgewater, New Jersey.
2005-05-13 Acquired Riggs National Trust Company in Mclean, Virginia.
2007-09-14 Acquired Farmers & Mechanics Bank in Frederick, Maryland.
2007-09-14 Acquired The Citizens National Bank in Laurel, Maryland.
2007-09-14 Acquired Mercantile Eastern Shore Bank in Chestertown, Maryland.
2007-09-14 Acquired The National Bank Of Fredericksburg in Fredericksburg, Virginia.
2007-09-14 Acquired Marshall National Bank And Trust Company in Marshall, Virginia.
2007-09-14 Acquired Mercantile Peninsula Bank in Selbyville, Delaware.
2007-09-14 Acquired The Annapolis Banking And Trust Company in Annapolis, Maryland.
2007-09-14 Acquired Westminster Union Bank in Westminster, Maryland.
2007-09-14 Acquired Mercantile County Bank in Elkton, Maryland.
2007-09-14 Acquired Mercantile Southern Maryland Bank in Leonardtown, Maryland.
2007-09-14 Acquired Mercantile-safe Deposit And Trust Company in Baltimore, Maryland.
2008-03-07 Acquired The Yardville National Bank in Yardville, New Jersey.
2008-08-08 Acquired Blc Bank N. A. in Strasburg, Pennsylvania.
2009-08-14 Acquired Dwelling House Savings And Loan Association in Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-08-21 Moved bank headquarters from Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania to Wilmington, Delaware.
2009-08-21 Acquired Pnc Bank, Delaware in Wilmington, Delaware.
2009-11-06 Acquired National City Bank in Cleveland, Ohio.

Total assets: $43,244,081,000
Total deposits: $24,414,243,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

PNC Bank, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with PNC Bank, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and PNC Bank, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-378

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.