PNC National Bank of Delaware

Delaware – New Castle – Wilmington

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

23717

1982

FDIC Certificate Number: 23717
FDIC's unique number: 16587
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Claymont

Federal Reserve ID Number: 179214
Report Date: 1997-09-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 17395
The date of the last data update: 1997-12-31

1982-03-10 Institution established. Original name: Provident Of Delaware Bank.
1982-09-07 Changed name to Provident Of Delaware Bank, National Association .
1985-01-01 Changed name to Pnc National Bank .
1996-12-20 Changed name to Pnc National Bank Of Delaware .
1997-12-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of PNC Bank, Delaware in Wilmington, Delaware.
2006-12-19 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Members Frs.
2006-12-19 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Reserve Board.
2008-08-09 Acquired Delaware Sterling Bank & Trust Company in Christiana, Delaware.
2009-08-21 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of PNC Bank, National Association in Wilmington, Delaware.
2009-11-06 Acquired National City Bank in Cleveland, Ohio.

Total assets: $199,308,000
Total deposits: $152,882,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

PNC National Bank of Delaware does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with PNC National Bank of Delaware, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and PNC National Bank of Delaware will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-479

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.