Powder Mill Bank

New Jersey – Morris – Morris Plains

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

27001

1987

FDIC Certificate Number: 27001
FDIC's unique number: 36433
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Jamesburg

Federal Reserve ID Number: 678801
Report Date: 1992-03-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1992-06-01

1987-06-29 Institution established. Original name: Powder Mill Bank.
1992-05-22 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Valley National Bank in Wayne, New Jersey.
1993-06-18 Acquired Peoples Bank, National Association in Belleville, New Jersey.
1994-11-30 Acquired Rockbank in Plainfield, New Jersey.
1995-02-28 Acquired American Union Bank in Union, New Jersey.
1995-06-30 Acquired Lakeland Savings Bank in Succasunna, New Jersey.
1997-03-01 Acquired The Midland Bank And Trust Company in Paramus, New Jersey.
1998-10-16 Acquired Wayne Savings Bank, F.S.B. in Wayne, New Jersey.
1999-06-11 Acquired The Ramapo Bank in Wayne Township, New Jersey.
2001-01-19 Acquired The Merchants Bank Of New York in New York City, New York.
2001-12-26 Reorganized.
2005-03-31 Acquired Shrewsbury State Bank in Shrewsbury, New Jersey.
2005-06-03 Acquired Norcrown Bank in Livingston, New Jersey.
2008-07-01 Moved bank headquarters from Passaic, New Jersey to Wayne, New Jersey.
2008-07-01 Acquired Greater Community Bank in Totowa, New Jersey.
2008-09-12 Reorganized.
2010-03-11 Acquired Libertypointe Bank in New York, New York as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-03-12 Acquired The Park Avenue Bank in New York, New York as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $49,587,000
Total deposits: $47,944,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Powder Mill Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Powder Mill Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Powder Mill Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-492

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.