Prairie National Bank

Illinois – Shelby – Stewardson

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

active

3741

1928

FDIC Certificate Number: 3741
FDIC's unique number: 2406
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Champaign

Federal Reserve ID Number: 408147
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 13226

Number of Domestic Offices: 2
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03

1928-08-04 Institution established. Original name: The Stewardson National Bank.
1995-09-30 Reorganized.
2005-06-01 Changed name to Prairie National Bank .

Total assets: $57,251,000
Total deposits: $49,769,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $49,769,000
Equity capital: $5,232,000

Net income: $184,000

Return on Assets: 0.65
Return on Equity: 7.39
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: Prairie Financial Bancorp, Inc.

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Prairie National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Prairie National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Prairie National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-190

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.