Premier National Bank of Dalton

Georgia – Whitfield – Dalton

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

34329

1996

FDIC Certificate Number: 34329
FDIC's unique number: 57088
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Atlanta

Federal Reserve ID Number: 2514042
Report Date: 2002-12-31

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 23127
The date of the last data update: 2003-04-24

1996-11-25 Institution established. Original name: Premier National Bank.
1998-01-01 Changed name to Premier National Bank Of Dalton .
2003-03-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Dalton Whitfield Bank in Dalton, Georgia.
2003-06-02 Changed name to Fsgbank, National Association .
2003-06-02 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Bank, National, Member Frs.
2003-09-24 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of FSGBANK, National Association in Chattanooga, Tennessee.
2004-08-10 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
2005-08-31 Acquired Jackson Bank & Trust in Gainesboro, Tennessee.

Total assets: $84,755,000
Total deposits: $73,487,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Premier National Bank of Dalton does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Premier National Bank of Dalton, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Premier National Bank of Dalton will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-457

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.