PremierBank & Trust

Ohio – Lorain – Elyria

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

12580

1895

FDIC Certificate Number: 12580
FDIC's unique number: 7992
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Columbus

Federal Reserve ID Number: 1007314
Report Date: 1998-03-31

Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 1999-12-27

1895-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Lorain County Savings & Trust Co.
1984-09-01 Changed name to Lorain County Bank .
1993-01-20 Changed name to Premierbank & Trust .
1993-07-30 Acquired The Crestline Federal Savings And Loan Association in Crestline, Ohio as part of a government assisted transaction.
1998-05-22 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Firstmerit Bank, National Association in Akron, Ohio.
1998-10-23 Acquired Security Federal Savings And Loan Association Of Cleveland in Mayfield Heights, Ohio.
1998-10-23 Acquired First Federal Savings Bank Of Kent in Kent, Ohio.
1999-02-12 Acquired Nc Interim National Bank in New Castle, Pennsylvania.
1999-02-12 Acquired Signal Bank, National Association in Wooster, Ohio.
1999-02-12 Acquired Summit Bank, National Association in Fairlawn, Ohio.
2010-02-19 Acquired George Washington Savings Bank in Orland Park, Illinois as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-05-14 Acquired Midwest Bank And Trust Company in Elmwood Park, Illinois as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $577,465,000
Total deposits: $505,490,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

PremierBank & Trust does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with PremierBank & Trust, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and PremierBank & Trust will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-314

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.