Rancho Bernardo Community Bank

California – San Diego – San Diego

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

34323

1997

FDIC Certificate Number: 34323
FDIC's unique number: 57082
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Orange

Federal Reserve ID Number: 2583347
Report Date: 2005-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 2005-09-19

1997-06-16 Institution established. Original name: Rancho Bernardo Community Bank.
1999-04-12 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Federal Reserve Board.
2005-08-19 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Community National Bank in Escondido, California.
2006-10-26 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Pacific Western Bank in San Diego, California.
2008-11-07 Acquired Security Pacific Bank in Los Angeles, California as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-08-28 Acquired Affinity Bank in Ventura, California as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-08-20 Acquired Los Padres Bank in Solvang, California as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-12-20 Moved bank headquarters from San Diego, California to Los Angeles, California.

Total assets: $124,483,000
Total deposits: $112,558,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Rancho Bernardo Community Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Rancho Bernardo Community Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Rancho Bernardo Community Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-463

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.