Rankin County Bank

Mississippi – Rankin – Brandon

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

8548

1905

FDIC Certificate Number: 8548
FDIC's unique number: 5455
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Jackson Ms

Federal Reserve ID Number: 502933
Report Date: 1987-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1905-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Rankin County Bank.
1985-05-24 Reorganized.
1987-09-08 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Trustmark National Bank in Jackson, Mississippi.
1987-12-31 Acquired The Commercial National Bank And Trust Company Of Laurel in Laurel, Mississippi.
1990-06-15 Acquired Unifirst Bank For Savings, A Federal Savings And Loan Association in Jackson, Mississippi.
1991-07-12 Acquired First Jackson Federal Savings Bank in Jackson, Mississippi.
1992-08-07 Acquired Foxworth Bank in Foxworth, Mississippi.
1993-07-31 Acquired Unisouth Banking Corporation in Columbus, Mississippi.
1994-10-07 Acquired First National Bank Of Vicksburg in Vicksburg, Mississippi.
1997-02-28 Acquired National Bank Of Commerce Of Corinth in Corinth, Mississippi.
1997-09-19 Acquired Perry County Bank in New Augusta, Mississippi.
1998-03-14 Acquired Smith County Bank in Taylorsville, Mississippi.
2001-04-06 Acquired Peoples Bank in Barretville, Tennessee.
2001-12-14 Acquired Nashoba Bank in Germantown, Tennessee.
2003-08-22 Acquired Southern Community Bank, Atlantic in Destin, Florida.
2004-01-23 Acquired Plaza Bank in Houston, Texas.
2006-08-25 Acquired Republic National Bank in Houston, Texas.
2011-04-15 Acquired Heritage Banking Group in Carthage, Mississippi as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $175,577,000
Total deposits: $156,201,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Rankin County Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Rankin County Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Rankin County Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-128

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.