Raritan Savings Bank

New Jersey – Somerset – Raritan

(SB) Savings banks, state charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SB) Savings banks, state charter

inactive

12016

1869

FDIC Certificate Number: 12016
FDIC's unique number: 7659
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Jamesburg

Federal Reserve ID Number: 1000306
Report Date: 1998-12-31

Bank Charter Class: SB
The date of the last data update: 1999-04-14

1869-04-18 Institution established. Original name: Raritan Savings Bank.
1987-05-21 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1996-07-31 Acquired Manville Savings Bank in Manville, New Jersey.
1999-03-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of United National Bank in Bridgewater, New Jersey.
2001-05-07 Changed name to United Trust Bank .
2001-05-07 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Members Frs.
2001-05-07 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Federal Reserve Board.
2002-08-24 Acquired Vista Bank, National Association in Phillipsburg, New Jersey.
2004-03-19 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of PNC Bank, National Association in Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania.
2005-05-13 Acquired Riggs National Trust Company in Mclean, Virginia.
2007-09-14 Acquired Farmers & Mechanics Bank in Frederick, Maryland.
2007-09-14 Acquired The Citizens National Bank in Laurel, Maryland.
2007-09-14 Acquired Mercantile Eastern Shore Bank in Chestertown, Maryland.
2007-09-14 Acquired The National Bank Of Fredericksburg in Fredericksburg, Virginia.
2007-09-14 Acquired Marshall National Bank And Trust Company in Marshall, Virginia.
2007-09-14 Acquired Mercantile Peninsula Bank in Selbyville, Delaware.
2007-09-14 Acquired The Annapolis Banking And Trust Company in Annapolis, Maryland.
2007-09-14 Acquired Westminster Union Bank in Westminster, Maryland.
2007-09-14 Acquired Mercantile County Bank in Elkton, Maryland.
2007-09-14 Acquired Mercantile Southern Maryland Bank in Leonardtown, Maryland.
2007-09-14 Acquired Mercantile-safe Deposit And Trust Company in Baltimore, Maryland.
2008-03-07 Acquired The Yardville National Bank in Yardville, New Jersey.
2008-08-08 Acquired Blc Bank N. A. in Strasburg, Pennsylvania.
2009-08-14 Acquired Dwelling House Savings And Loan Association in Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-08-21 Moved bank headquarters from Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania to Wilmington, Delaware.
2009-08-21 Acquired Pnc Bank, Delaware in Wilmington, Delaware.
2009-11-06 Acquired National City Bank in Cleveland, Ohio.

Total assets: $431,533,000
Total deposits: $359,808,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Raritan Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Raritan Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Raritan Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-36

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.