Reelfoot Bank

Tennessee – Obion – Union City

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 3.72 ] – good Voters 1   Comments 1

Details

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

active

9199

1904

FDIC Certificate Number: 9199
FDIC's unique number: 5891
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Memphis

Federal Reserve ID Number: 149253
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SM

Number of Domestic Offices: 6
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03

1904-08-02 Institution established. Original name: Reelfoot Bank.
1989-12-29 Acquired Dukedom Bank in Dukedom, Tennessee.
1989-12-29 Moved bank headquarters from Hornbeak, Tennessee to Union City, Tennessee.
2001-11-13 Acquired Fulton Bank in Fulton, Kentucky.
2001-11-13 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
2005-12-27 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Federal Reserve Board.
2005-12-27 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Members Frs.

Total assets: $148,585,000
Total deposits: $132,568,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $132,568,000
Equity capital: $13,433,000

Net income: $367,000

Return on Assets: 0.5
Return on Equity: 5.62
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: Reelfoot Bancshares, Inc.

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Reelfoot Bank has received 1 rating(s) and 1 review(s), resulting in an average rating of 3.72 on a scale from 1 to 5. The overall rating for this bank is good.

If you have personal experience with Reelfoot Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Reelfoot Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Ashley

PM: Data is available for other stnoiecs as well. We will be posting an analysis of other stnoiecs as well soon.Dear S: The ipair site as always works intermittently. If you will send me an email, I will send you the decision directly.

Was this review helpful to you?

Do you trust this financial institution?
How convenient is access to their products and services?
Rate your satisfaction with services and products
Banking fees and charges
Rate on-line access
Rate their support/assistance
How competitive their rates are?

0     0    


     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-385

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.