Regions Bank

Alabama – Jefferson – Birmingham

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

active

12368

1928

FDIC Certificate Number: 12368
FDIC's unique number: 7866
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Shelby

Federal Reserve ID Number: 233031
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SM

Number of Domestic Offices: 1779
Number of Foreign Offices: 3
The date of the last data update: 2011-02-24

1928-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Exchange-security Bank.
1975-01-31 Changed name to First Alabama Bank Of Birmingham .
1984-06-04 Changed name to First Alabama Bank .
1985-03-22 Acquired First Alabama Bank Of Huntsville, N. A. in Huntsville, Alabama.
1985-03-22 Acquired First Alabama Bank Of Montgomery, N. A. in Montgomery, Alabama.
1985-03-22 Moved bank headquarters from Birmingham, Alabama to Montgomery, Alabama.
1985-05-25 Acquired First Alabama Bank Of Walker County in Cordova, Alabama.
1985-05-25 Acquired First Alabama Bank Of Guntersville in Guntersville, Alabama.
1985-05-25 Acquired First Alabama Bank Of Hartselle in Hartselle, Alabama.
1985-06-08 Acquired First Alabama Bank Of Anniston, National Association in Anniston, Alabama.
1985-06-08 Acquired First Alabama Bank Of Talladega County, N.A. in Talladega, Alabama.
1985-06-08 Acquired First Alabama Bank Of Gadsden, N. A. in Gadsden, Alabama.
1985-06-15 Acquired First Alabama Bank Of South Baldwin in Foley, Alabama.
1985-06-15 Acquired First Alabama Bank Of Baldwin County, N. A. in Bay Minette, Alabama.
1985-06-15 Acquired First Alabama Bank Of Conecuh County in Evergreen, Alabama.
1985-06-22 Acquired First Alabama Bank Of Sumter County in Livingston, Alabama.
1985-09-21 Acquired First Alabama Bank Of Chilton County in Thorsby, Alabama.
1985-10-12 Acquired First Alabama Bank Of Phenix City, N. A. in Phenix City, Alabama.
1985-10-26 Acquired First Alabama Bank Of Lee County, N.A. in Opelika, Alabama.
1985-11-09 Acquired First Alabama Bank Of Troy, National Association in Troy, Alabama.
1985-11-16 Acquired First Alabama Bank Of Selma, N. A. in Selma, Alabama.
1985-11-23 Acquired First Alabama Bank Of Cullman in Cullman, Alabama.
1985-12-07 Acquired First Alabama Bank Of Lauderdale County in Rogersville, Alabama.
1985-12-14 Acquired First Alabama Bank Of Athens, N. A. in Athens, Alabama.
1986-02-15 Acquired First Alabama Bank Of Mobile, National Assoication in Mobile, Alabama.
1986-04-19 Acquired First Alabama Bank Of Dothan in Dothan, Alabama.
1986-05-17 Acquired First Alabama Bank Of Tuscaloosa, N. A. in Tuscaloosa, Alabama.
1986-08-25 Acquired First State Bank Of Alabama in Decatur, Alabama.
1986-09-29 Acquired Shelby State Bank in Pelham, Alabama.
1986-12-13 Acquired First Citizens Bank Of Alabama in Oneonta, Alabama.
1987-04-04 Acquired Enterprise Banking Company in Enterprise, Alabama.
1987-10-23 Reorganized.
1987-10-23 Acquired The Albertville National Bank in Prattville, Alabama.
1988-04-08 Acquired The Choctaw Bank Of Butler in Butler, Alabama.
1988-06-18 Acquired First Alabama Bank Of Covington County in Andalusia, Alabama.
1990-08-10 Acquired Baldwin County Federal Savings Bank in Robertsdale, Alabama.
1990-09-14 Acquired City Federal Savings And Loan Association in Birmingham, Alabama.
1994-07-08 Acquired The First Bank Of Fayette in Fayette, Alabama.
1995-01-20 Acquired Union Bank & Trust Company in Montgomery, Alabama.
1996-06-10 Moved bank headquarters from Montgomery, Alabama to Birmingham, Alabama.
1996-11-12 Changed name to Regions Bank .
1997-08-09 Acquired Regions Bank Of Georgia in Columbus, Georgia.
1997-08-09 Acquired Regions Bank Of Tennessee in Nashville, Tennessee.
1997-09-26 Acquired Regions Bank Of Florida in Pensacola, Florida.
1997-11-07 Acquired Regions Bank, National Association in Longwood, Florida.
1997-12-31 Acquired Regions Bank Of Louisiana in Baton Rouge, Louisiana.
1998-02-02 Acquired Regions Bank in Gainesville, Georgia.
1998-02-06 Acquired Bank Of Morgan County in Madison, Georgia.
1998-02-06 Acquired The Bank Of Millen in Millen, Georgia.
1998-03-13 Acquired Smyrna Bank & Trust Company in Smyrna, Georgia.
1998-03-13 Acquired First Bank Of Georgia in East Point, Georgia.
1998-03-23 Acquired Allied Bank Of Georgia in Thomson, Georgia.
1998-04-13 Acquired Regions Bank, Fsb in Griffin, Georgia.
1998-04-24 Acquired First State Bank & Trust Company in Albany, Georgia.
1998-04-29 Acquired First State Bank And Trust Company In Cordele in Cordele, Georgia.
1998-05-11 Acquired Regions Bank, National Association in Anderson, South Carolina.
1998-05-11 Acquired Regions Bank, National Association in Spartanburg, South Carolina.
1998-06-20 Acquired The New Iberia Bank in New Iberia, Louisiana.
1998-07-23 Acquired Palmetto Federal Savings Bank Of South Carolina in Aiken, South Carolina.
1998-08-13 Acquired Citizens First Bank in El Dorado, Arkansas.
1998-08-13 Acquired First Commercial Bank, National Association Of Memphis in Memphis, Tennessee.
1998-08-27 Acquired State First National Bank in Texarkana, Arkansas.
1998-08-27 Acquired State First National Bank in Texarkana, Texas.
1998-09-10 Acquired Kilgore First National Bank in Kilgore, Texas.
1998-09-10 Acquired Longview National Bank in Longview, Texas.
1998-09-10 Acquired The Stone Fort National Bank Of Nacogdoches in Nacogdoches, Texas.
1998-09-10 Acquired The First National Bank Of Palestine in Palestine, Texas.
1998-09-10 Acquired Lufkin National Bank in Lufkin, Texas.
1998-09-10 Acquired Tyler Bank And Trust, National Association in Tyler, Texas.
1998-09-18 Acquired First Commercial Trust Company, National Association in Little Rock, Arkansas.
1998-09-24 Acquired The Security Bank in Harrison, Arkansas.
1998-09-24 Acquired First Commercial Bank, Rogers in Rogers, Arkansas.
1998-09-24 Acquired Arkansas State Bank in Clarksville, Arkansas.
1998-10-09 Acquired First National Bank Of Russellville in Russellville, Arkansas.
1998-10-09 Acquired The First National Bank Of Conway in Conway, Arkansas.
1998-10-09 Acquired Clinton State Bank in Clinton, Arkansas.
1998-10-09 Acquired Morrilton Security Bank, National Association in Morrilton, Arkansas.
1998-10-22 Acquired Arkansas Bank And Trust Company in Hot Springs, Arkansas.
1998-10-22 Acquired Citizens First Bank in Arkadelphia, Arkansas.
1998-10-22 Acquired Citizens First Bank in Fordyce, Arkansas.
1998-10-22 Acquired Benton State Bank in Benton, Arkansas.
1998-11-05 Acquired First Commercial Bank, National Association in Little Rock, Arkansas.
1998-11-19 Acquired Springhill Bank & Trust Company in Springhill, Louisiana.
1998-11-20 Acquired The First National Bank Of Nashville in Nashville, Arkansas.
1998-11-20 Acquired First National Bank in Searcy, Arkansas.
1998-12-03 Acquired First Bank Of Arkansas in Jonesboro, Arkansas.
1999-03-26 Acquired Greenville National Bank in Greenville, South Carolina.
1999-03-26 Acquired Valdosta Bank And Trust in Valdosta, Georgia.
1999-04-23 Acquired Etowah Bank in Canton, Georgia.
1999-06-25 Acquired The Bank Of Newnan in Newnan, Georgia.
1999-06-25 Acquired Fayette County Bank in Peachtree City, Georgia.
1999-07-16 Acquired The St. Mary Bank And Trust Company in Franklin, Louisiana.
1999-07-16 Acquired The Village Bank Of Florida in Tampa, Florida.
1999-09-10 Acquired The Arkansas Bank in Jonesboro, Arkansas.
1999-09-10 Acquired The Arkansas Bank in Walnut Ridge, Arkansas.
1999-09-10 Acquired The Planters Bank in Osceola, Arkansas.
1999-09-10 Acquired The Arkansas Bank National Association in Batesville, Arkansas.
1999-10-08 Acquired St. James Bank & Trust Company in Lutcher, Louisiana.
1999-10-08 Acquired Regions Bank, National Association in Bradenton, Florida.
1999-11-05 Acquired Jacobs Bank in Scottsboro, Alabama.
1999-11-05 Acquired Meigs County Bank in Decatur, Tennessee.
2000-05-09 Acquired Bank Of Huntland in Huntland, Tennessee.
2000-05-09 Acquired Lincoln County Bank in Fayetteville, Tennessee.
2000-06-23 Acquired Minden Bank & Trust Company in Minden, Louisiana.
2000-09-08 Acquired Security First National Bank in Alexandria, Louisiana.
2000-10-13 Acquired Bank At Ormond-by-the-sea in Volusia County, Florida.
2000-11-10 Acquired Texas Heritage Bank in Hutto, Texas.
2001-07-10 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Federal Reserve Board.
2001-07-10 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Members Frs.
2002-03-08 Acquired Park Meridian Bank in Charlotte, North Carolina.
2002-04-05 Acquired First Bank Of Texas in Tomball, Texas.
2002-05-17 Acquired Independence Bank, National Associ

Total assets: $126,719,736,000
Total deposits: $99,112,292,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $98,397,236,000
Equity capital: $15,603,036,000

Net income: $193,167,000

Return on Assets: 0.3
Return on Equity: 2.51
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: Regions Financial Corporation

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Regions Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Regions Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Regions Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-13221

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.