Republic National Bank of Miami

Florida – Miami-Dade – Miami

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

19511

1965

FDIC Certificate Number: 19511
FDIC's unique number: 13311
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: South Florida

Federal Reserve ID Number: 755533
Report Date: 1999-06-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 15555
The date of the last data update: 1999-09-18

1965-11-08 Institution established. Original name: Republic National Bank Of Miami.
1988-01-29 Acquired The Trust Bank in Hialeah, Florida.
1990-08-17 Acquired Miami Savings Bank in Miami, Florida.
1991-01-11 Acquired General Federal Savings Bank in Miami, Florida.
1995-06-02 Acquired Plaza Bank Of Miami in Coral Gables, Florida.
1999-07-16 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Union Planters Bank, National Association in Memphis, Tennessee.
1999-08-13 Acquired Union Planters Bank Of Kentucky, National Association in Paducah, Kentucky.
2000-02-12 Acquired First State Bank Of Covington, Tennessee in Covington, Tennessee.
2002-06-21 Acquired Jefferson Heritage Bank in Denton, Texas.
2003-06-09 Acquired Union Planters Bank Of Northwest Tennessee Fsb in Paris, Tennessee.
2004-12-11 Acquired Union Planters Bank Of The Lakeway Area in Morristown, Tennessee.
2005-06-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Regions Bank in Birmingham, Alabama.
2005-09-29 Acquired Regions Morgan Keegan Trust, F.S.B. in Birmingham, Alabama.
2006-11-04 Acquired Amsouth Bank in Birmingham, Alabama.
2007-11-30 Reorganized.
2008-08-29 Acquired Integrity Bank in Alpharetta, Georgia as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-02-06 Acquired Firstbank Financial Services in Mcdonough, Georgia as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $1,513,652,000
Total deposits: $1,317,610,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Republic National Bank of Miami does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Republic National Bank of Miami, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Republic National Bank of Miami will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-438

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.