RSI BANK

New Jersey – Union – Rahway

(SB) Savings banks, state charter

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SB) Savings banks, state charter

active

12017

1851

FDIC Certificate Number: 12017
FDIC's unique number: 7660
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Jamesburg

Federal Reserve ID Number: 148809
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SB

Number of Domestic Offices: 4
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03

1851-03-12 Institution established. Original name: The Rahway Savings Institution.
1999-01-06 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
2005-06-16 Changed name to Rsi Bank .

Total assets: $490,705,000
Total deposits: $394,295,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $394,295,000
Equity capital: $71,342,000

Net income: $1,239,000

Return on Assets: 0.51
Return on Equity: 3.51
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: Rsi Bancorp, Mhc

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

RSI BANK does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with RSI BANK, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and RSI BANK will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-35

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.