Security State Bank, Harlem, Montana

Montana – Blaine – Harlem

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

345

1917

FDIC Certificate Number: 345
FDIC's unique number: 274
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Billings

Federal Reserve ID Number: 646350
Report Date: 1994-09-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1994-12-05

1917-06-07 Institution established. Original name: Security State Bank, Harlem, Montana.
1994-11-21 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Rocky Mountain Bank in Billings, Montana.
1996-06-01 Moved bank headquarters from Harlem, Montana to Billings, Montana.
1996-06-01 Acquired Security State Bank, Plentywood, Montana in Plentywood, Montana.
2005-01-07 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Not Members Of The Frs.
2005-01-07 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Reserve Board to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
2007-06-07 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.

Total assets: $20,292,000
Total deposits: $17,197,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Security State Bank, Harlem, Montana does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Security State Bank, Harlem, Montana, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Security State Bank, Harlem, Montana will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-467

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.