Sedgwick County Bank

Colorado – Sedgwick – Julesburg

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member

inactive

23504

1981

FDIC Certificate Number: 23504
FDIC's unique number: 16469
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Denver

Federal Reserve ID Number: 321750
Report Date: 1986-09-30

Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1981-07-27 Institution established. Original name: Sedgwick County Bank.
1986-11-05 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of First National Bank in Julesburg, Colorado.
2001-08-13 Changed name to First National Bank .
2004-03-22 Acquired Haxtun Community Bank in Haxtun, Colorado.
2008-04-01 Changed name to Points West Community Bank .
2008-04-01 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Not Members Of The Frs.
2008-04-01 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
2011-07-08 Acquired Signature Bank in Windsor, Colorado as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $3,825,000
Total deposits: $3,665,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Sedgwick County Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Sedgwick County Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Sedgwick County Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-110

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.