Sentry Savings and Loan Association

New Jersey – Essex – Caldwell

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

29763

1890

FDIC Certificate Number: 29763
FDIC's unique number: 42597
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Jamesburg

Federal Reserve ID Number: 124278
Report Date: 1981-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1999-06-09

1890-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Sentry Savings And Loan Association.
1981-05-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of North Jersey Savings and Loan Association in Passaic, New Jersey.
1989-02-17 Entered into a conservatorship.
1990-12-21 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of North Jersey Federal Savings Association in Passaic, New Jersey.
1991-06-07 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Valley National Bank in Passaic, New Jersey.
1991-09-13 Acquired First Jersey Savings, F.A. in Wyckoff, New Jersey.
1991-09-27 Acquired Nutley Savings Bank, Sla in Nutley, New Jersey.
1991-10-18 Acquired Yorkwood Federal Savings And Loan Association in Maplewood, New Jersey.
1992-05-22 Acquired Powder Mill Bank in Morris Plains, New Jersey.
1993-01-29 Acquired Mayflower Savings Bank Sla in Livingston, New Jersey.
1993-06-18 Acquired Peoples Bank, National Association in Belleville, New Jersey.
1994-11-30 Acquired Rockbank in Plainfield, New Jersey.
1995-02-28 Acquired American Union Bank in Union, New Jersey.
1995-06-30 Acquired Lakeland Savings Bank in Succasunna, New Jersey.
1997-03-01 Acquired The Midland Bank And Trust Company in Paramus, New Jersey.
1998-10-16 Acquired Wayne Savings Bank, F.S.B. in Wayne, New Jersey.
1999-06-11 Acquired The Ramapo Bank in Wayne Township, New Jersey.
2001-01-19 Acquired The Merchants Bank Of New York in New York City, New York.
2001-12-26 Reorganized.
2005-03-31 Acquired Shrewsbury State Bank in Shrewsbury, New Jersey.
2005-06-03 Acquired Norcrown Bank in Livingston, New Jersey.
2008-07-01 Moved bank headquarters from Passaic, New Jersey to Wayne, New Jersey.
2008-07-01 Acquired Greater Community Bank in Totowa, New Jersey.
2008-09-12 Reorganized.
2010-03-11 Acquired Libertypointe Bank in New York, New York as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-03-12 Acquired The Park Avenue Bank in New York, New York as part of a government assisted transaction.

Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Sentry Savings and Loan Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Sentry Savings and Loan Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Sentry Savings and Loan Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-101

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.