Service 1st Bank

California – San Joaquin – Stockton

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

35215

1999

FDIC Certificate Number: 35215
FDIC's unique number: 76182
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Sacramento

Federal Reserve ID Number: 2857806
Report Date: 2008-09-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2008-11-25

1999-11-10 Institution established. Original name: Service 1st Bank.
2008-11-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Central Valley Community Bank in Fresno, California.

Total assets: $231,124,000
Total deposits: $197,069,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Service 1st Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Service 1st Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Service 1st Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-256

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.