Shore Bank and Trust Company

Massachusetts – Essex – Lynn

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

27002

1987

FDIC Certificate Number: 27002
FDIC's unique number: 36434
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: North Boston

Federal Reserve ID Number: 753605
Report Date: 1991-12-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1992-08-20

1987-07-16 Institution established. Original name: Shore Bank And Trust Company.
1992-04-24 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Eastern Bank in Boston, Massachusetts.
1993-10-12 Acquired First Colonial Bank For Savings in Lynn, Massachusetts.
1994-11-11 Acquired Saugus Bank And Trust Company in Saugus, Massachusetts.
1998-02-28 Acquired The Hibernia Savings Bank in Quincy, Massachusetts.
2002-11-22 Acquired Eastern Bank And Trust Company in Salem, Massachusetts.
2003-03-31 Moved bank headquarters from Lynn, Massachusetts to Boston, Massachusetts.
2005-05-28 Acquired Plymouth Savings Bank in Wareham, Massachusetts.
2007-05-12 Acquired Sharon Co-operative Bank in Sharon, Massachusetts.
2008-10-10 Acquired Massbank in Reading, Massachusetts.
2011-03-18 Acquired Wainwright Bank & Trust Company in Boston, Massachusetts.

Total assets: $183,184,000
Total deposits: $184,170,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Shore Bank and Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Shore Bank and Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Shore Bank and Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-489

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.