Southern Community Bank and Trust

North Carolina – Forsyth – Winston Salem

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

34321

1996

FDIC Certificate Number: 34321
FDIC's unique number: 57080
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Charlotte

Federal Reserve ID Number: 2514547
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM

Number of Domestic Offices: 22
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2007-02-23

1996-11-18 Institution established. Original name: Southern Community Bank And Trust.
1998-03-31 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Limited Trust Powers Granted.
2001-02-02 Moved bank headquarters from Winston-salem, North Carolina to Winston Salem, North Carolina.
2001-02-02 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Federal Reserve Board.
2001-02-02 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Members Frs.
2004-10-18 Acquired The Community Bank in Pilot Mountain, North Carolina.
2006-11-17 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Reserve Board to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.
2006-11-17 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Not Members Of The Frs.

Total assets: $1,559,298,000
Total deposits: $1,253,630,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $1,253,630,000
Equity capital: $134,003,000

Net income: $2,454,000

Return on Assets: 0.31
Return on Equity: 3.73
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: Southern Community Financial Corporation

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Southern Community Bank and Trust does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Southern Community Bank and Trust, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Southern Community Bank and Trust will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-465

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.