Southern National Bank at Tallulah

Louisiana – Madison – Tallulah

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

17357

1954

FDIC Certificate Number: 17357
FDIC's unique number: 11366
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Shreveport

Federal Reserve ID Number: 703253
Report Date: 1994-06-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 14716
The date of the last data update: 1994-08-15

1954-09-20 Institution established. Original name: Southern National Bank At Tallulah.
1991-04-08 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1993-04-22 Changed trust powers from Full Trust Powers Granted to Trust Powers Terminated.
1993-08-31 Reorganized.
1994-08-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Hibernia National Bank in New Orleans, Louisiana.
1994-12-31 Acquired First State Bank And Trust Company in Franklinton, Louisiana.
1994-12-31 Acquired Pioneer Bank & Trust Company in Shreveport, Louisiana.
1995-03-01 Acquired American Bank in Norco, Louisiana.
1995-05-01 Acquired State Bank And Trust Company in Donaldsonville, Louisiana.
1995-07-01 Acquired Bank Of St. John in Reserve, Louisiana.
1995-07-01 Acquired Progressive Bank And Trust Company in Houma, Louisiana.
1996-01-01 Acquired The First National Bank Of Lake Providence in Lake Providence, Louisiana.
1996-01-15 Acquired Bunkie Bank & Trust Company in Bunkie, Louisiana.
1996-08-26 Acquired The Calcasieu-marine National Bank Of Lake Charles in Lake Charles, Louisiana.
1996-10-01 Acquired St. Bernard Bank & Trust Co. in Arabi, Louisiana.
1998-01-01 Acquired First National Bank In Mansfield in Mansfield, Louisiana.
1998-02-01 Acquired Argentbank in Thibodaux, Louisiana.
1998-07-01 Acquired Peoples Bank & Trust Company in Minden, Louisiana.
1999-01-01 Acquired Hibernia National Bank Of Texas in Texarkana, Texas.
1999-03-08 Acquired First Service Bank in Marshall, Texas.
1999-05-21 Acquired Beaumont Trust Company, National Association in Beaumont, Texas.
2004-05-13 Acquired Coastal Banc, S.S.B. in Houston, Texas.
2006-04-24 Changed name to Capital One, National Association .
2007-07-01 Moved bank headquarters from New Orleans, Louisiana to Mclean, Virginia.
2007-07-01 Acquired Capital One, F.S.B. in Mclean, Virginia.
2007-08-01 Acquired North Fork Bank in Mattituck, New York.
2008-03-08 Acquired Superior Savings Of New England, National Association in Branford, Connecticut.
2009-07-30 Acquired Chevy Chase Bank, F.S.B. in Mclean, Virginia.
2011-04-01 Reorganized.

Total assets: $58,560,000
Total deposits: $52,472,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Southern National Bank at Tallulah does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Southern National Bank at Tallulah, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Southern National Bank at Tallulah will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-348

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.