Southern National Bank of Broward County

Florida – Broward – Pompano Beach

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

21487

1974

FDIC Certificate Number: 21487
FDIC's unique number: 14860
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: South Florida

Federal Reserve ID Number: 311733
Report Date: 1986-09-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 20616
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1974-03-20 Institution established. Original name: Southern National Bank Of Broward County.
1980-10-01 Changed name to Southern Bank Of Broward County .
1985-03-22 Changed name to Southern National Bank Of Broward County .
1986-12-22 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Florida National Bank in Jacksonville, Florida.
1990-03-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Union National Bank of Florida in Jacksonville, Florida.
1991-08-02 Acquired Florida Federal Savings, F.S.B. in St. Petersburg, Florida.
1991-09-19 Acquired Southeast Bank, National Association in Miami, Florida.
1991-09-19 Acquired Southeast Bank Of West Florida in Pensacola, Florida.
1991-09-20 Acquired American Pioneer Federal Savings Bank in Daytona Beach, Florida.
1992-03-27 Acquired Flagler Federal Savings And Loan Association in Miami, Florida.
1992-04-10 Acquired Security First Federal Savings And Loan Association in Daytona Beach, Florida.
1993-07-22 Acquired Meritor Savings Bank, F.A. in Winter Haven, Florida.
1993-12-31 Acquired The Enterprise Bank, National Association in Winter Park, Florida.
1994-04-08 Acquired Jacksonville Federal Savings Association in Jacksonville, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.
1994-08-01 Acquired Bancflorida, A Federal Savings Bank in Naples, Florida.
1994-08-19 Acquired Hollywood Federal Savings Bank in Hollywood, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.
1995-04-01 Acquired First Florida Savings Bank, F.S.B. in Miami, Florida.
1995-06-01 Acquired Coral Gables Federal Savings And Loan Association in Coral Gables, Florida.
1995-07-01 Acquired American Savings Of Florida, F.S.B. in Miami, Florida.
1996-06-01 Acquired Society First Federal Savings Bank in Fort Myers, Florida.
1996-11-26 Acquired Home Savings Bank, F.S.B. in Hollywood, Florida.
1997-06-05 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Union National Bank in Charlotte, North Carolina.
1997-07-31 Acquired First Union National Bank Of Virginia in Roanoke County, Virginia.
1997-07-31 Acquired First Union Bank Of Connecticut in Stamford, Connecticut.
1997-07-31 Acquired First Union National Bank Of Maryland in Rockville, Maryland.
1997-07-31 Acquired First Union National Bank Of South Carolina in Greenville, South Carolina.
1997-07-31 Acquired First Union National Bank Of Washington, D.c. in Washington, District Of Columbia.
1997-07-31 Acquired First Union National Bank Of Tennessee in Nashville, Tennessee.
1997-11-29 Acquired Signet Bank in Richmond, Virginia.
1998-02-26 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Union National Bank in Charlotte, North Carolina.
1998-02-27 Acquired Signet Trust Company in Richmond, Virginia.
1998-05-15 Acquired Corestates Bank, National Association in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania.
1998-08-13 Acquired Mentor Trust Company in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania.
1998-08-13 Acquired Mentor Trust Company in Richmond, Virginia.
1999-07-16 Acquired Keystone Trust Company in Portsmouth, New Hampshire.
1999-12-01 Acquired Meridian Trust Company in Reading, Pennsylvania.
2002-04-01 Changed name to Wachovia Bank, National Association .
2002-04-01 Acquired Wachovia Bank, National Association in Winston-salem, North Carolina.
2002-12-31 Acquired The First National Bank Of Atlanta in New Castle, Delaware.
2002-12-31 Acquired Offitbank in New York City, New York.
2003-11-06 Acquired Atlantic Savings Bank, F.S.B. in Hilton Head Island, South Carolina.
2004-12-01 Acquired First Union Direct Bank, National Association in Augusta, Georgia.
2005-01-03 Acquired Southtrust Bank in Birmingham, Alabama.
2006-03-01 Acquired Western Financial Bank, National Association in Irvine, California.
2007-10-12 Acquired World Savings Bank Interim, National Association in Oceanside, New York.
2008-06-01 Acquired A.g. Edwards Trust Company, Fsb in St. Louis, Missouri.
2010-03-20 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association in Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
2010-04-10 Acquired Wachovia Card Services, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2010-05-10 Acquired Wells Fargo Hsbc Trade Bank, National Association in San Francisco, California.
2010-11-01 Acquired Wells Fargo Alaska Trust Company, National Association in Anchorage, Alaska.
2011-03-31 Acquired Wells Fargo Central Bank in Calabasas, California.

Total assets: $27,094,000
Total deposits: $23,272,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Southern National Bank of Broward County does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Southern National Bank of Broward County, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Southern National Bank of Broward County will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-1265

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.