Southtrust Bank of Cleburne County, National Association

Alabama – Cleburne – Heflin

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

26837

1986

FDIC Certificate Number: 26837
FDIC's unique number: 36063
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Shelby

Federal Reserve ID Number: 58533
Report Date: 1991-12-31

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 18737
The date of the last data update: 1992-05-11

1986-11-17 Institution established. Original name: Southtrust Bank Of Cleburne County, National Association.
1992-02-14 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of SouthTrust Bank of Calhoun County, National Association in Anniston, Alabama.
1995-01-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of SouthTrust Bank of Alabama, National Association in Birmingham, Alabama.
1997-06-02 Changed name to Southtrust Bank, National Association .
1997-06-02 Acquired Southtrust Bank Of Columbus, National Association in Columbus, Georgia.
1997-06-02 Acquired Ssouthtrust Bank Of Northwest Florida in Marianna, Florida.
1997-06-02 Acquired Southtrust Bank Of Florida, National Association in St. Petersburg, Florida.
1997-06-02 Acquired Southtrust Bank Of South Mississippi in Biloxi, Mississippi.
1997-06-02 Acquired Southtrust Bank Of Georgia, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
1997-06-02 Acquired Southtrust Bank Of Tennessee, National Association in Nashville, Tennessee.
1997-06-02 Acquired Southtrust Bank Of South Carolina, National Association in Charleston, South Carolina.
1997-06-02 Acquired Southtrust Bank Of North Carolina in Concord, North Carolina.
1997-06-02 Acquired Southtrust Bank Of Russell County in Phenix City, Alabama.
1997-09-19 Acquired Barnett Bank Of Southwest Georgia in Columbus, Georgia.
1998-01-30 Acquired First Of America Bank - Florida, Fsb in Tampa, Florida.
1998-06-19 Acquired American National Bank Of Florida in Jacksonville, Florida.
1998-07-01 Acquired Southtrust Asset Management Company Of Florida, National Association in South Pasadena, Florida.
1998-07-01 Acquired Southtrust Asset Management Company Of Georgia, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
1998-07-01 Acquired Southtrust Estate & Trust Services Of The Carolinas, Inc. in Charlotte, North Carolina.
1998-08-07 Acquired Marine Bank in St. Petersburg, Florida.
1998-10-30 Acquired Securitybank Texas in Arlington, Texas.
1998-11-23 Acquired Georgia National Bank in Athens, Georgia.
1998-12-11 Acquired First American Bank Of Indian River County in Vero Beach, Florida.
1999-03-12 Acquired Langham Creek National Bank in Houston, Texas.
1999-07-30 Acquired Navigation Bank in Houston, Texas.
1999-08-13 Acquired First Bank And Trust in Groves, Texas.
2000-01-14 Acquired Heritage Bank in Waxahachie, Texas.
2000-04-14 Acquired Security National Bank Of San Antonio in San Antonio, Texas.
2000-06-06 Changed name to Southtrust Bank .
2000-06-06 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Members Frs.
2000-06-06 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Reserve Board.
2000-12-15 Acquired First Bank in Tallahassee, Florida.
2001-03-16 Acquired Independent National Bank in Irving, Texas.
2001-03-30 Acquired Bayshore National Bank Of La Porte in La Porte, Texas.
2001-08-03 Acquired Cenit Bank in Norfolk, Virginia.
2001-11-20 Acquired The Bank Of Tidewater in Virginia Beach, Virginia.
2001-11-30 Acquired Commerce Bank in Richmond, Virginia.
2002-03-01 Acquired Landmark Bank in Euless, Texas.
2003-06-20 Acquired Founders National Bank-skillman in Dallas, Texas.
2004-05-14 Acquired Floridafirst Bank in Lakeland, Florida.
2005-01-03 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Wachovia Bank, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
2006-03-01 Acquired Western Financial Bank, National Association in Irvine, California.
2007-10-12 Acquired World Savings Bank Interim, National Association in Oceanside, New York.
2008-06-01 Acquired A.g. Edwards Trust Company, Fsb in St. Louis, Missouri.
2010-03-20 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association in Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
2010-04-10 Acquired Wachovia Card Services, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2010-05-10 Acquired Wells Fargo Hsbc Trade Bank, National Association in San Francisco, California.
2010-11-01 Acquired Wells Fargo Alaska Trust Company, National Association in Anchorage, Alaska.
2011-03-31 Acquired Wells Fargo Central Bank in Calabasas, California.

Total assets: $15,012,000
Total deposits: $13,348,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Southtrust Bank of Cleburne County, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Southtrust Bank of Cleburne County, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Southtrust Bank of Cleburne County, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-430

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.