St. Joseph Capital Bank

Indiana – St. Joseph – Mishawaka

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

34324

1997

FDIC Certificate Number: 34324
FDIC's unique number: 57083
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Indianapolis

Federal Reserve ID Number: 2474940
Report Date: 2006-12-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2007-03-28

1997-02-13 Institution established. Original name: St. Joseph Capital Bank.
2004-10-07 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Limited Trust Powers Granted.
2007-02-02 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Old National Bank in Evansville, Indiana.
2011-01-01 Acquired Monroe Bank in Bloomington, Indiana.
2011-07-29 Acquired Integra Bank National Association in Evansville, Indiana as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $492,948,000
Total deposits: $393,365,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

St. Joseph Capital Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with St. Joseph Capital Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and St. Joseph Capital Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-462

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.