State Bank

Kansas – Sheridan – Hoxie

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

26832

1986

FDIC Certificate Number: 26832
FDIC's unique number: 36058
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Hays

Federal Reserve ID Number: 872953
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM

Number of Domestic Offices: 3
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2008-01-08

1986-11-13 Institution established. Original name: Prairie State Bank.
1986-11-13 Acquired The Hoxie State Bank in Hoxie, Kansas.
1987-01-12 Changed name to State Bank Of Hoxie .
1993-06-15 Acquired Peoples State Bank in Grinnell, Kansas.
1993-06-21 Changed name to State Bank .

Total assets: $127,306,000
Total deposits: $114,118,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $114,118,000
Equity capital: $12,752,000

Net income: $1,061,000

Return on Assets: 1.7
Return on Equity: 17.35
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: State Bank Employees Stock Ownership Plan

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-433

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.