State Bank and Trust Company

Mississippi – Covington – Collins

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

8549

1934

FDIC Certificate Number: 8549
FDIC's unique number: 5456
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Jackson Ms

Federal Reserve ID Number: 451433
Report Date: 1988-12-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1934-01-01 Institution established. Original name: State Bank And Trust Company.
1989-02-28 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of Simpson County in Magee, Mississippi.
1993-06-01 Changed name to Citizens State Bank .
1994-07-01 Acquired Citizens Bank And Trust Company in Morton, Mississippi.
2003-03-01 Changed name to Priorityone Bank .

Total assets: $32,500,000
Total deposits: $28,822,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

State Bank and Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with State Bank and Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and State Bank and Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-127

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.