State Bank & Trust

North Dakota – Cass – Fargo

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

19581

1966

FDIC Certificate Number: 19581
FDIC's unique number: 13381
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Fargo

Federal Reserve ID Number: 929352
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM

Number of Domestic Offices: 16
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03

1966-05-06 Institution established. Original name: State Bank Of Fargo.
2003-07-18 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
2003-09-02 Acquired State Bank Of West Fargo in West Fargo, North Dakota.
2003-09-02 Changed name to State Bank & Trust .
2003-09-02 Acquired State Bank Of Moorhead in Moorhead, Minnesota.
2004-01-01 Acquired Northern Capital Trust Company in Fargo, North Dakota.
2005-05-31 Acquired First State Bank Of Audubon in Detroit Lakes, Minnesota.

Total assets: $2,015,174,000
Total deposits: $1,724,519,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $1,724,519,000
Equity capital: $194,321,000

Net income: $12,234,000

Return on Assets: 1.2
Return on Equity: 12.57
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: State Bankshares, Inc.

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

State Bank & Trust does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with State Bank & Trust, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and State Bank & Trust will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-361

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.