Sun Bank/Citrus County, National Association

Florida – Citrus – Crystal River

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

24571

1983

FDIC Certificate Number: 24571
FDIC's unique number: 17073
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Gainesville

Federal Reserve ID Number: 47434
Report Date: 1986-09-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 17834
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1983-04-21 Institution established. Original name: Flagship National Bank Of Citrus County.
1984-02-01 Changed name to Sun Bank/citrus County, National Association .
1986-11-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Sun Bank and Trust Company in Brooksville, Florida.
1994-01-06 Acquired Sun Bank Of Pasco County in Zephyrhills, Florida.
1995-05-12 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Sun Bank and Trust Company in Brooksville, Florida.
1995-10-06 Changed name to Suntrust Bank, Nature Coast .
2000-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of SunTrust Bank in Atlanta, Georgia.
2000-08-18 Moved bank headquarters from Brooksville, Florida to Atlanta, Georgia.
2003-06-02 Acquired Lighthouse Community Bank in Hilton Head Island, South Carolina.
2005-04-22 Acquired National Bank Of Commerce in Memphis, Tennessee.
2005-04-22 Acquired Nbc Bank, Fsb in Memphis, Tennessee.
2005-04-22 Acquired Suntrust Bankcard, National Association in Orlando, Florida.
2008-07-25 Acquired Gainesville Bank & Trust in Gainesville, Georgia.
2008-07-25 Acquired Community Trust Bank in Hiram, Georgia.
2008-07-25 Acquired First National Bank Of The South in Milledgeville, Georgia.
2008-07-25 Acquired United Bank & Trust Company in Rockmart, Georgia.
2008-07-25 Acquired Home Town Bank Of Villa Rica in Villa Rica, Georgia.
2008-07-25 Acquired First National Bank Of Gwinnett in Duluth, Georgia.
2008-07-25 Acquired Mountain State Bank in Dawsonville, Georgia.
2008-08-01 Acquired First Priority Bank in Bradenton, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $38,345,000
Total deposits: $34,883,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Sun Bank/Citrus County, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Sun Bank/Citrus County, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Sun Bank/Citrus County, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-445

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.