Sunshine Bank of Fort Walton Beach

Florida – Okaloosa – Fort Walton Beach

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

20256

1970

FDIC Certificate Number: 20256
FDIC's unique number: 13935
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Pensacola

Federal Reserve ID Number: 691631
Report Date: 1988-09-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1970-09-19 Institution established. Original name: Eglin National Bank.
1980-01-02 Changed name to Sunshine Bank Of Fort Walton Beach .
1988-11-18 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Sunshine Bank in Pensacola, Florida.
1989-06-23 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1993-10-22 Acquired First Federal Savings Bank Of De Funiak Springs in Defuniak Springs, Florida.
1993-12-17 Acquired First Federal Savings Bank in Marianna, Florida.
1993-12-20 Changed name to Regions Bank Of Florida .
1994-05-06 Acquired Security Federal Savings Association in Panama City, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.
1997-06-13 Acquired First Federal Savings Bank Of Citrus County in Inverness, Florida.
1997-07-10 Acquired The Key Bank Of Florida in Hillsborough County, Florida.
1997-07-25 Acquired Florida Firstbank in Panama City, Florida.
1997-09-19 Acquired First Federal Savings Bank Of New Smyrna in New Smyrna Beach, Florida.
1997-09-26 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Regions Bank in Birmingham, Alabama.
1997-11-07 Acquired Regions Bank, National Association in Longwood, Florida.
1997-12-31 Acquired Regions Bank Of Louisiana in Baton Rouge, Louisiana.
1998-02-02 Acquired Regions Bank in Gainesville, Georgia.
1998-02-06 Acquired Bank Of Morgan County in Madison, Georgia.
1998-02-06 Acquired The Bank Of Millen in Millen, Georgia.
1998-03-13 Acquired Smyrna Bank & Trust Company in Smyrna, Georgia.
1998-03-13 Acquired First Bank Of Georgia in East Point, Georgia.
1998-03-23 Acquired Allied Bank Of Georgia in Thomson, Georgia.
1998-04-13 Acquired Regions Bank, Fsb in Griffin, Georgia.
1998-04-24 Acquired First State Bank & Trust Company in Albany, Georgia.
1998-04-29 Acquired First State Bank And Trust Company In Cordele in Cordele, Georgia.
1998-05-11 Acquired Regions Bank, National Association in Anderson, South Carolina.
1998-05-11 Acquired Regions Bank, National Association in Spartanburg, South Carolina.
1998-06-20 Acquired The New Iberia Bank in New Iberia, Louisiana.
1998-07-23 Acquired Palmetto Federal Savings Bank Of South Carolina in Aiken, South Carolina.
1998-08-13 Acquired Citizens First Bank in El Dorado, Arkansas.
1998-08-13 Acquired First Commercial Bank, National Association Of Memphis in Memphis, Tennessee.
1998-08-27 Acquired State First National Bank in Texarkana, Arkansas.
1998-08-27 Acquired State First National Bank in Texarkana, Texas.
1998-09-10 Acquired Kilgore First National Bank in Kilgore, Texas.
1998-09-10 Acquired Longview National Bank in Longview, Texas.
1998-09-10 Acquired The Stone Fort National Bank Of Nacogdoches in Nacogdoches, Texas.
1998-09-10 Acquired The First National Bank Of Palestine in Palestine, Texas.
1998-09-10 Acquired Lufkin National Bank in Lufkin, Texas.
1998-09-10 Acquired Tyler Bank And Trust, National Association in Tyler, Texas.
1998-09-18 Acquired First Commercial Trust Company, National Association in Little Rock, Arkansas.
1998-09-24 Acquired The Security Bank in Harrison, Arkansas.
1998-09-24 Acquired First Commercial Bank, Rogers in Rogers, Arkansas.
1998-09-24 Acquired Arkansas State Bank in Clarksville, Arkansas.
1998-10-09 Acquired First National Bank Of Russellville in Russellville, Arkansas.
1998-10-09 Acquired The First National Bank Of Conway in Conway, Arkansas.
1998-10-09 Acquired Clinton State Bank in Clinton, Arkansas.
1998-10-09 Acquired Morrilton Security Bank, National Association in Morrilton, Arkansas.
1998-10-22 Acquired Arkansas Bank And Trust Company in Hot Springs, Arkansas.
1998-10-22 Acquired Citizens First Bank in Arkadelphia, Arkansas.
1998-10-22 Acquired Citizens First Bank in Fordyce, Arkansas.
1998-10-22 Acquired Benton State Bank in Benton, Arkansas.
1998-11-05 Acquired First Commercial Bank, National Association in Little Rock, Arkansas.
1998-11-19 Acquired Springhill Bank & Trust Company in Springhill, Louisiana.
1998-11-20 Acquired The First National Bank Of Nashville in Nashville, Arkansas.
1998-11-20 Acquired First National Bank in Searcy, Arkansas.
1998-12-03 Acquired First Bank Of Arkansas in Jonesboro, Arkansas.
1999-03-26 Acquired Greenville National Bank in Greenville, South Carolina.
1999-03-26 Acquired Valdosta Bank And Trust in Valdosta, Georgia.
1999-04-23 Acquired Etowah Bank in Canton, Georgia.
1999-06-25 Acquired The Bank Of Newnan in Newnan, Georgia.
1999-06-25 Acquired Fayette County Bank in Peachtree City, Georgia.
1999-07-16 Acquired The St. Mary Bank And Trust Company in Franklin, Louisiana.
1999-07-16 Acquired The Village Bank Of Florida in Tampa, Florida.
1999-09-10 Acquired The Arkansas Bank in Jonesboro, Arkansas.
1999-09-10 Acquired The Arkansas Bank in Walnut Ridge, Arkansas.
1999-09-10 Acquired The Planters Bank in Osceola, Arkansas.
1999-09-10 Acquired The Arkansas Bank National Association in Batesville, Arkansas.
1999-10-08 Acquired St. James Bank & Trust Company in Lutcher, Louisiana.
1999-10-08 Acquired Regions Bank, National Association in Bradenton, Florida.
1999-11-05 Acquired Jacobs Bank in Scottsboro, Alabama.
1999-11-05 Acquired Meigs County Bank in Decatur, Tennessee.
2000-05-09 Acquired Bank Of Huntland in Huntland, Tennessee.
2000-05-09 Acquired Lincoln County Bank in Fayetteville, Tennessee.
2000-06-23 Acquired Minden Bank & Trust Company in Minden, Louisiana.
2000-09-08 Acquired Security First National Bank in Alexandria, Louisiana.
2000-10-13 Acquired Bank At Ormond-by-the-sea in Volusia County, Florida.
2000-11-10 Acquired Texas Heritage Bank in Hutto, Texas.
2001-07-10 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Members Frs.
2001-07-10 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Federal Reserve Board.
2002-03-08 Acquired Park Meridian Bank in Charlotte, North Carolina.
2002-04-05 Acquired First Bank Of Texas in Tomball, Texas.
2002-05-17 Acquired Independence Bank, National Association in Harris County, Texas.
2002-07-12 Acquired Brookhollow National Bank in Dallas, Texas.
2005-06-30 Acquired Union Planters Bank, National Association in Memphis, Tennessee.
2005-09-29 Acquired Regions Morgan Keegan Trust, F.S.B. in Birmingham, Alabama.
2006-11-04 Acquired Amsouth Bank in Birmingham, Alabama.
2007-11-30 Reorganized.
2008-08-29 Acquired Integrity Bank in Alpharetta, Georgia as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-02-06 Acquired Firstbank Financial Services in Mcdonough, Georgia as part of a government assisted transaction.

Total assets: $91,431,000
Total deposits: $84,378,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

Sunshine Bank of Fort Walton Beach does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with Sunshine Bank of Fort Walton Beach, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Sunshine Bank of Fort Walton Beach will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-89

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.