The Amelia State Bank

Ohio – Clermont – Amelia

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

16917

1910

FDIC Certificate Number: 16917
FDIC's unique number: 11001
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Columbus

Federal Reserve ID Number: 90010
Report Date: 1973-09-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1999-05-05

1910-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Amelia State Bank.
1973-12-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The First National Bank of Bethel, Ohio in Bethel, Ohio.
1974-03-20 Changed name to First National Bank Of Clermont County .
1980-03-22 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Society National Bank in Cleveland, Ohio.
1980-09-20 Acquired The First National Bank Of Harrison in Harrison, Ohio.
1982-09-20 Acquired The Second National Bank Of Ravenna in Ravenna, Ohio.
1986-02-17 Acquired Centran Bank Of Akron in Akron, Ohio.
1986-02-18 Acquired Central National Bank Of Cleveland in Cleveland, Ohio.
1987-05-17 Acquired Society Bank Of Northwest Ohio in Port Clinton, Ohio.
1987-05-18 Acquired Society Bank Of The Firelands in Vermilion, Ohio.
1989-09-08 Acquired Society Bank Of Eastern Ohio, National Association in Canton, Ohio.
1992-02-17 Acquired Society Bank, National Association in Dayton, Ohio.
1992-07-13 Acquired Ameritrust Company National Association in Cleveland, Ohio.
1992-09-28 Acquired Ameritrust Development Bank in Cleveland, Ohio.
1993-08-23 Acquired Society Bank & Trust in Toledo, Ohio.
1994-09-16 Acquired State Home Savings Bank, F.S.B. in Bowling Green, Ohio.
1996-06-17 Changed name to Keybank National Association .
1996-06-17 Acquired Keybank National Association in Bryan, Ohio.
1997-06-23 Acquired Key Trust Company Of Florida, National Association in Naples, Florida.
1997-06-30 Acquired Keybank National Association in Salt Lake City, Utah.
1998-06-30 Acquired Keybank National Association in Bedford, New Hampshire.
1998-07-31 Acquired Keytrust Company National Association in Cheyenne, Wyoming.
1999-08-16 Reorganized.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company National Association in Albany, New York.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company National Association in Portland, Maine.
2000-12-29 Acquired Society Trust Company Of New York in New York City, New York.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company National Association in Seattle, Washington.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company Of Ohio, National Association in Cleveland, Ohio.
2000-12-29 Acquired Key Trust Company Of Indiana, National Association in Indianapolis, Indiana.
2003-01-17 Acquired Union Bank & Trust in Denver, Colorado.
2003-11-20 Reorganized.
2004-10-01 Acquired Key Bank Usa, National Association in Cleveland, Ohio.
2004-11-12 Acquired Evertrust Bank in Everett, Washington.
2008-01-17 Acquired Union State Bank in Nanuet, New York.

Total assets: $3,967,000
Total deposits: $3,460,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The Amelia State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The Amelia State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Amelia State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-391

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.