The Bank

New Jersey – Burlington – Mount Laurel

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

27614

1989

FDIC Certificate Number: 27614
FDIC's unique number: 40448
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Jamesburg

Federal Reserve ID Number: 1407932
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM

Number of Domestic Offices: 48
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-01-06

1989-10-30 Institution established. Original name: The Bank Of Gloucester County.
2002-01-01 Changed name to The Bank .
2003-02-16 Acquired Woodstown National Bank in Woodstown, New Jersey.
2007-02-10 Acquired First Washington State Bank in Windsor, New Jersey.
2010-03-22 Moved bank headquarters from Woodbury, New Jersey to Mount Laurel, New Jersey.

Total assets: $2,034,054,000
Total deposits: $1,690,866,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $1,690,866,000
Equity capital: $281,008,000

Net income: $78,000

Return on Assets: 0.01
Return on Equity: 0.06
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: Fulton Financial Corporation

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-120

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.