The Bank of Atchison County

Missouri – Atchison – Rock Port

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

17255

1870

FDIC Certificate Number: 17255
FDIC's unique number: 11280
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Kansas City

Federal Reserve ID Number: 779557
Report Date: 1993-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1993-09-21

1870-01-10 Institution established. Original name: The Bank Of Atchison County.
1975-03-31 Moved bank headquarters from Rockport, Missouri to Rock Port, Missouri.
1993-09-07 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank Midwest, National Association in Maryville, Missouri.
1994-08-11 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank Midwest, National Association in Kansas City, Missouri.
1995-02-17 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank Midwest, National Association in Kansas City, Missouri.
1995-05-08 Acquired Citizens Bank & Trust Of Kansas City in Kansas City, Kansas.
2001-01-12 Acquired The Cameron Savings And Loan Association, F.A. in Cameron, Missouri.
2001-02-17 Acquired Hardin Federal Savings Bank in Hardin, Missouri.
2003-06-13 Acquired Founders Bank in Chesterfield, Missouri.
2010-12-10 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Armed Forces Bank, National Association in Fort Leavenworth, Kansas.

Total assets: $34,956,000
Total deposits: $31,592,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The Bank of Atchison County does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The Bank of Atchison County, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Bank of Atchison County will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-45

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.