The Bank of Houston

Mississippi – Chickasaw – Houston

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

12202

1930

FDIC Certificate Number: 12202
FDIC's unique number: 7750
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Jackson Ms

Federal Reserve ID Number: 785848
Report Date: 1971-09-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1999-05-05

1930-08-08 Institution established. Original name: The Bank Of Houston.
1971-08-12 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of Mississippi in Tupelo, Mississippi.
1973-07-26 Acquired The Bank Of West Point in West Point, Mississippi.
1973-10-24 Acquired Bank Of Olive Branch in Olive Branch, Mississippi.
1974-06-29 Acquired Grenada Trust And Banking Company in Grenada, Mississippi.
1980-05-12 Acquired Security Bank Of Hernando in Hernando, Mississippi.
1982-04-15 Acquired Monroe Banking And Trust Company in Aberdeen, Mississippi.
1987-01-01 Acquired First Mississippi National Bank in Hattiesburg, Mississippi.
1987-04-22 Acquired Bank Of North Mississippi in Oakland, Mississippi.
1987-05-28 Acquired The American Bank in Vicksburg, Mississippi.
1994-04-15 Acquired Security Federal Savings And Loan Association in Jackson, Mississippi as part of a government assisted transaction.
1995-08-01 Acquired First Federal Bank For Savings in Starkville, Mississippi.
1996-12-16 Acquired Laurel Federal Savings And Loan Association in Laurel, Mississippi.
1997-03-03 Acquired Iuka Guaranty Bank in Iuka, Mississippi.
1997-06-20 Changed name to Bancorpsouth Bank .
1997-06-20 Acquired Volunteer Bank in Jackson, Tennessee.
1998-10-30 Acquired First Community Bank Of The South in Fort Deposit, Alabama.
1998-10-30 Acquired Highland Bank in Birmingham, Alabama.
1998-12-04 Acquired Merchants Bank in Vicksburg, Mississippi.
1998-12-31 Acquired The First National Bank Of Opelika in Opelika, Alabama.
1999-02-27 Acquired The Home Bank in Guntersville, Alabama.
2000-09-01 Acquired The Bank Of North Arkansas in Melbourne, Arkansas.
2000-09-01 Acquired The First National Bank Of El Dorado in El Dorado, Arkansas.
2000-09-01 Acquired The City National Bank Of Fort Smith in Fort Smith, Arkansas.
2000-09-01 Acquired The Citizens National Bank Of Hope in Hope, Arkansas.
2000-09-01 Acquired First United Bank in Stuttgart, Arkansas.
2000-09-01 Acquired Merchants And Planters Bank, National Association in Camden, Arkansas.
2000-09-01 Acquired First National Bank Of Magnolia in Magnolia, Arkansas.
2000-09-01 Acquired First Republic Bank in Monroe, Louisiana.
2000-09-01 Acquired Firstbank in Texarkana, Texas.
2000-09-01 Acquired Fredonia State Bank in Nacogdoches, Texas.
2000-09-01 Acquired City Bank & Trust Of Shreveport, Louisiana in Shreveport, Louisiana.
2000-09-01 Acquired First United Trust Company, National Association in El Dorado, Arkansas.
2000-10-31 Acquired First Federal Savings And Loan Association in Texarkana, Arkansas.
2002-02-28 Acquired Pinnacle Bank in Little Rock, Arkansas.
2004-12-31 Acquired Premier Bank Of Brentwood in Brentwood, Tennessee.
2004-12-31 Acquired The Business Bank in Baton Rouge, Louisiana.
2005-12-01 Acquired American State Bank in Jonesboro, Arkansas.
2006-09-01 Acquired First Kensington Bank in Tampa, Florida.
2007-07-02 Acquired The Signature Bank in Springfield, Missouri.

Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The Bank of Houston does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The Bank of Houston, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Bank of Houston will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-402

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.