The Bank of Northern Arizona

Arizona – Coconino – Flagstaff

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

22672

1978

FDIC Certificate Number: 22672
FDIC's unique number: 15824
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Phoenix

Federal Reserve ID Number: 455664
Report Date: 1982-03-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04

1978-06-27 Institution established. Original name: The Bank Of Northern Arizona.
1982-05-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of United Bank of Arizona in Phoenix, Arizona.
1984-10-01 Acquired Bank Of Cochise in Sierra Vista, Arizona.
1988-06-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Citibank in Phoenix, Arizona.
1989-12-07 Acquired First Commerce National Bank in Phoenix, Arizona.
1990-02-15 Acquired Gateway National Bank in Phoenix, Arizona.
1990-03-15 Acquired Independent National Bank in Phoenix, Arizona.
1990-04-26 Acquired Guardian Bank in Scottsdale, Arizona.
1993-09-01 Closed voluntarily and liquidated its assets.

Total assets: $14,084,000
Total deposits: $11,138,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The Bank of Northern Arizona does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The Bank of Northern Arizona, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Bank of Northern Arizona will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-143

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.