The Bessemer National Bank

Michigan – Gogebic – Bessemer

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

5053

1932

FDIC Certificate Number: 5053
FDIC's unique number: 3374
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Appleton

Federal Reserve ID Number: 229351
Report Date: 1986-06-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 13607
The date of the last data update: 1999-05-05

1932-03-29 Institution established. Original name: The Bessemer National Bank.
1986-09-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First of America Bank - Gogebic, National Association in Ironwood, Michigan.
1989-11-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First of America Bank-Upper Peninsula, National Association in Marquette, Michigan.
1990-01-01 Acquired First Of America Bank-iron Mountain, National Association in Iron Mountain, Michigan.
1994-12-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First of America Bank - Michigan, National Association in Kalamazoo, Michigan.
1995-03-31 Changed from the Bank Insurance Fund to the Savings Association Insurance Fund.
1995-03-31 Changed name to First Of America Bank-michigan, National Association .
1995-03-31 Moved bank headquarters from Marquette, Michigan to Grand Rapids, Michigan.
1995-03-31 Acquired First Of America Bank-west Michigan, National Association in Grand Rapids, Michigan.
1997-06-30 Changed name to First Of America Bank, National Association .
1997-06-30 Moved bank headquarters from Grand Rapids, Michigan to Kalamazoo, Michigan.
1997-06-30 Acquired First Of America Bank-indiana in Indianapolis, Indiana.
1998-10-31 Changed name to National City Bank Of Michigan/illinois .
1998-10-31 Moved bank headquarters from Kalamazoo, Michigan to Bannockburn, Illinois.
1998-10-31 Moved bank headquarters from Kalamazoo, Michigan to Bannockburn, Illinois.
1998-10-31 Acquired First Of America Bank-illinois, National Association in Bannockburn, Illinois.
2004-06-19 Changed name to National City Bank Of The Midwest .
2004-07-30 Acquired Allegiant Bank in Saint Louis, Missouri.
2006-07-22 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of National City Bank in Cleveland, Ohio.
2006-08-19 Acquired Pioneer Bank And Trust Company in Saint Louis, Missouri.
2007-03-17 Acquired Harbor Federal Savings Bank in Fort Pierce, Florida.
2007-04-14 Acquired Fidelity Federal Bank & Trust in West Palm Beach, Florida.
2008-02-09 Acquired Midamerica Bank, Fsb in Clarendon Hills, Illinois.
2008-12-30 Acquired New England Trust Company, National Association in Warwick, Rhode Island.
2009-09-30 Reorganized.
2009-11-06 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of PNC Bank, National Association in Wilmington, Delaware.

Total assets: $25,079,000
Total deposits: $20,340,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The Bessemer National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The Bessemer National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Bessemer National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-285

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.