The Blackstone Bank and Trust Company

Massachusetts – Suffolk – Boston

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

27003

1987

FDIC Certificate Number: 27003
FDIC's unique number: 36435
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: South Boston

Federal Reserve ID Number: 935700
Report Date: 1990-12-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1991-03-19

1987-07-20 Institution established. Original name: The Blackstone Bank And Trust Company.
1991-03-15 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of BayBank Boston, National Association in Boston, Massachusetts.
1993-01-25 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1995-08-31 Changed name to Baybank Boston, National Association .
1995-08-31 Acquired Baybank Connecticut, National Association in Springfield, Massachusetts.
1995-10-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of BayBank, National Association in Boston, Massachusetts.
1997-05-23 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of BankBoston, National Association in Boston, Massachusetts.
1997-05-23 Acquired Baybank Nh, National Association in Burlington, Massachusetts.
1997-10-16 Acquired Bank Of Boston Connecticut in Hartford, Connecticut.
1997-10-31 Acquired Pacific National Bank Of Nantucket in Nantucket, Massachusetts.
1998-05-21 Acquired Rhode Island Hospital Trust National Bank in Providence, Rhode Island.
2000-03-01 Changed name to Fleet National Bank .
2000-03-01 Moved bank headquarters from Boston, Massachusetts to Providence, Rhode Island.
2000-03-01 Acquired Fleet National Bank in Providence, Rhode Island.
2000-04-03 Acquired Bank Of Boston - Florida, National Association in Boca Raton, Florida.
2000-04-03 Acquired Fleet Trust And Investment Services Company, National Association in Stuart, Florida.
2000-04-03 Acquired Fleet Bank, F.S.B. in Boca Raton, Florida.
2000-05-01 Acquired Fleet Bank-nh in Manchester, New Hampshire.
2000-09-01 Acquired Fleet Bank, National Association in Jersey City, New Jersey.
2000-10-02 Acquired Fleet Bank Of Maine in Portland, Maine.
2001-03-01 Acquired Summit Bank in Hackensack, New Jersey.
2001-03-01 Acquired Summit Bank in Bethlehem, Pennsylvania.
2001-03-01 Acquired Summit Bank in Norwalk, Connecticut.
2004-02-01 Acquired Progress Bank in Blue Bell, Pennsylvania.
2005-03-18 Acquired Fleet Maine, National Association in South Portland, Maine.
2005-06-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Bank of America, National Association in Charlotte, North Carolina.
2006-09-22 Acquired Mbna America Delaware, National Association in Wilmington, Delaware.
2008-02-22 Acquired United States Trust Company , National Association in New York, New York.
2008-06-30 Acquired Bank Of America Georgia, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank National Association in Chicago, Illinois.
2008-10-17 Acquired Lasalle Bank Midwest National Association in Troy, Michigan.
2009-01-16 Maintained operations with government open bank assistance.
2009-04-27 Acquired Countrywide Bank, Fsb in Centennial, Colorado.
2009-07-01 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank Usa in Salt Lake City, Utah.
2009-11-02 Acquired Merrill Lynch Bank & Trust Co., Fsb in New York, New York.

Total assets: $49,258,000
Total deposits: $48,356,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The Blackstone Bank and Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The Blackstone Bank and Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Blackstone Bank and Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-490

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.