The Citizens National Bank of Toluca

Illinois – Marshall – Toluca

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

3748

1919

FDIC Certificate Number: 3748
FDIC's unique number: 2413
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Princeton

Federal Reserve ID Number: 467742
Report Date: 1998-06-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 11333
The date of the last data update: 1998-07-10

1919-04-18 Institution established. Original name: The Citizens National Bank Of Toluca.
1998-07-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Alpha Community Bank in Toluca, Illinois.
2008-09-06 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Morton Community Bank in Morton, Illinois.
2009-05-22 Acquired Citizens National Bank in Macomb, Illinois as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-08-14 Acquired Tremont Savings Bank in Tremont, Illinois.
2010-12-10 Acquired Citizens State Bank Of Cropsey in Cropsey, Illinois.

Total assets: $38,150,000
Total deposits: $34,102,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The Citizens National Bank of Toluca does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The Citizens National Bank of Toluca, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Citizens National Bank of Toluca will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-181

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.