The Cleveland State Bank

Mississippi – Bolivar – Cleveland

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

12201

1908

FDIC Certificate Number: 12201
FDIC's unique number: 7749
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Jackson Ms

Federal Reserve ID Number: 12142
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM

Number of Domestic Offices: 5
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03

1908-02-08 Institution established. Original name: The Cleveland State Bank.
1991-10-21 Reorganized.

Total assets: $178,199,000
Total deposits: $149,651,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $149,651,000
Equity capital: $20,171,000

Net income: $616,000

Return on Assets: 0.69
Return on Equity: 6.31
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: Cleveland State Bancorp, Inc.

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The Cleveland State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The Cleveland State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Cleveland State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-401

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.