The Coastal Bank of Georgia

Georgia – Glynn – Brunswick

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

16911

1950

FDIC Certificate Number: 16911
FDIC's unique number: 10996
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Savannah

Federal Reserve ID Number: 300531
Report Date: 2010-03-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2010-06-15

1950-06-01 Institution established. Original name: The Coastal Bank Of Georgia.
1982-09-29 Moved bank headquarters from St. Simons Island, Georgia to Brunswick, Georgia.
1987-01-30 Acquired First National Bank Of Camden County in Saint Marys, Georgia.
2010-06-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Synovus Bank in Columbus, Georgia.
2010-06-30 Acquired The Bank Of Nashville in Nashville, Tennessee.
2010-06-30 Acquired Trust One Bank in Memphis, Tennessee.

Total assets: $546,298,000
Total deposits: $453,296,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The Coastal Bank of Georgia does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The Coastal Bank of Georgia, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Coastal Bank of Georgia will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-393

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.