The Community Bank

Ohio – Muskingum – Zanesville

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

active

5981

1902

FDIC Certificate Number: 5981
FDIC's unique number: 4056
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Columbus

Federal Reserve ID Number: 729011
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM

Number of Domestic Offices: 7
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2009-12-17

1902-07-28 Institution established. Original name: The Crooksville Bank.
1988-07-29 Reorganized.
1991-07-01 Changed name to The Community Bank .
2008-01-31 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
2009-12-09 Moved bank headquarters from Crooksville, Ohio to Zanesville, Ohio.

Total assets: $262,721,000
Total deposits: $239,688,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $239,688,000
Equity capital: $21,983,000

Net income: $806,000

Return on Assets: 0.65
Return on Equity: 7.8
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: Communitybanc, Inc.

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The Community Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The Community Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Community Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-13

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.