The Elmira Savings Bank, FSB

New York – Chemung – Elmira

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

active

16001

1869

FDIC Certificate Number: 16001
FDIC's unique number: 10231
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Syracuse

Federal Reserve ID Number: 861304
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: SA
OCC Charter Number: 708E3

Number of Domestic Offices: 11
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-07-21

1869-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Elmira Savings Bank.
1983-05-16 Changed name to The Elmira Savings Bank, Fsb .
1985-03-01 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.

Total assets: $499,829,000
Total deposits: $366,584,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $366,584,000
Equity capital: $58,476,000

Net income: $2,422,000

Return on Assets: 0.97
Return on Equity: 8.47
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The Elmira Savings Bank, FSB does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The Elmira Savings Bank, FSB, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Elmira Savings Bank, FSB will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-334

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.