The Fifth Ward Savings Bank

New Jersey – Hudson – Jersey City

(SB) Savings banks, state charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SB) Savings banks, state charter

inactive

12014

1883

FDIC Certificate Number: 12014
FDIC's unique number: 7657
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Jamesburg

Federal Reserve ID Number: 560401
Report Date: 1970-12-31

Bank Charter Class: SB
The date of the last data update: 1995-06-09

1883-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Fifth Ward Savings Bank.
1970-11-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Hudson City Savings Bank in Jersey City, New Jersey.
1982-03-12 Acquired United States Savings Bank Of Newark, N. J. in Newark, New Jersey.
1982-05-14 Moved bank headquarters from Jersey City, New Jersey to Paramus, New Jersey.
1984-09-29 Acquired Orange Savings Bank in Livingston, New Jersey.
1995-07-17 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
1999-07-13 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
2004-01-01 Changed institution class to Occ Supervised Savings Banks.
2004-01-01 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Office Of Thrift Supervision.
2006-07-14 Acquired Sound Federal Savings in White Plains, New York.
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.

Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The Fifth Ward Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The Fifth Ward Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Fifth Ward Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-34

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.