The First National Bank in Tremont

Illinois – Tazewell – Tremont

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

active

3749

1931

FDIC Certificate Number: 3749
FDIC's unique number: 2414
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Springfield Il

Federal Reserve ID Number: 353546
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 13579

Number of Domestic Offices: 3
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03

1931-11-18 Institution established. Original name: The First National Bank In Tremont.
1990-07-31 Reorganized.
2004-03-12 Acquired Community Bank Of Hopedale in Hopedale, Illinois.

Total assets: $117,280,000
Total deposits: $104,053,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $104,053,000
Equity capital: $11,533,000

Net income: $243,000

Return on Assets: 0.41
Return on Equity: 4.31
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: Tremont Bancorp, Inc.

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The First National Bank in Tremont does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The First National Bank in Tremont, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The First National Bank in Tremont will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-182

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.