The First National Bank of Altavista

Virginia – Campbell – Altavista

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

active

6811

1908

FDIC Certificate Number: 6811
FDIC's unique number: 4582
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Richmond

Federal Reserve ID Number: 979629
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 9295

Number of Domestic Offices: 9
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03

1908-03-01 Institution established. Original name: The First National Bank Of Altavista.
1997-05-01 Reorganized.

Total assets: $334,978,000
Total deposits: $304,933,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $304,933,000
Equity capital: $28,400,000

Net income: $335,000

Return on Assets: 0.2
Return on Equity: 2.38
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Bank Holding Company: Pinnacle Bankshares Corporation

No associations

Map

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The First National Bank of Altavista does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The First National Bank of Altavista, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The First National Bank of Altavista will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-217

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.