The First National Bank of Keystone

West Virginia – McDowell – Northfork

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

6771

1904

FDIC Certificate Number: 6771
FDIC's unique number: 4549
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Scott Depot

Federal Reserve ID Number: 387028
Report Date: 1999-06-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 10369
The date of the last data update: 1999-09-09

1904-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The First National Bank Of Keystone.
1999-09-07 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Ameribank, Inc. in Welch, West Virginia.
1999-09-07 FDIC closing information for The First National Bank Of Keystone : http://www.fdic.gov/news/news/press/1999/pr9952.html.
2008-09-19 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Pioneer Community Bank, Inc. in Iaeger, West Virginia.
2008-09-19 FDIC closing information for Ameribank, Inc. : http://www.fdic.gov/bank/individual/failed/ameribank.html.

Total assets: $1,119,865,000
Total deposits: $880,859,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The First National Bank of Keystone does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The First National Bank of Keystone, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The First National Bank of Keystone will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-277

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.