The First National Bank of Thomasboro

Illinois – Champaign – Thomasboro

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

inactive

3746

1906

FDIC Certificate Number: 3746
FDIC's unique number: 2411
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Champaign

Federal Reserve ID Number: 350947
Report Date: 1987-12-31

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 8155
The date of the last data update: 1999-05-05

1906-04-06 Institution established. Original name: The First National Bank Of Thomasboro.
1988-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Busey Bank in Urbana, Illinois.
1989-11-03 Acquired State Bank Of St. Joseph in St. Joseph, Illinois.
1991-11-16 Acquired Citizens Bank Of Tolono in Tolono, Illinois.
1991-11-16 Acquired Community Bank Of Mahomet in Mahomet, Illinois.
1991-11-16 Acquired Bank Of Urbana in Urbana, Illinois.
1993-06-30 Acquired Eagle Bank Of Champaign County, National Association in Rantoul, Illinois.
1996-01-19 Acquired Busey Bank Of Mclean County in Le Roy, Illinois.
1998-11-01 Acquired Busey Business Bank in Indianapolis, Indiana.
2005-05-21 Acquired First Capital Bank in Peoria, Illinois.
2007-11-10 Moved bank headquarters from Urbana, Illinois to Champaign, Illinois.
2007-11-10 Acquired Main Street Bank & Trust in Champaign, Illinois.
2009-08-28 Acquired Busey Bank, National Association in Fort Myers, Florida.

Total assets: $14,752,000
Total deposits: $13,516,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The First National Bank of Thomasboro does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The First National Bank of Thomasboro, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The First National Bank of Thomasboro will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-183

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.