The First State Bank in Seagraves

Texas – Gaines – Seagraves

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

16918

1917

FDIC Certificate Number: 16918
FDIC's unique number: 11002
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Lubbock

Federal Reserve ID Number: 236564
Report Date: 1990-12-31

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1991-04-10

1917-08-17 Institution established. Original name: The First National Bank In Seagraves.
1970-12-01 Changed name to The First State Bank In Seagraves .
1991-01-24 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The First State Bank of Dimmitt in Dimmitt, Texas.
1994-12-01 Changed name to First United Bank .
1994-12-01 Acquired Shadow Hills National Bank in Lubbock, Texas.
2000-07-15 Acquired The First National Bank Of Sudan in Sudan, Texas.
2007-01-01 Acquired The First National Bank Of Lamesa in Lamesa, Texas.

Total assets: $34,693,000
Total deposits: $30,533,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The First State Bank in Seagraves does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The First State Bank in Seagraves, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The First State Bank in Seagraves will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-387

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.