The First State Bank of Pineville

Kentucky – Bell – Pineville

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember

inactive

270

1800

FDIC Certificate Number: 270
FDIC's unique number: 216
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Knoxville

Federal Reserve ID Number: 418614
Report Date: 1983-06-30

Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1999-05-05

1800-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The First State Bank Of Pineville.
1983-07-06 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The First State Bank of Pineville in Pineville, Kentucky.
2004-07-01 Changed name to First State Financial, Inc. .
2004-07-01 Acquired First State, Fsb in Lexington, Kentucky.

Total assets: $24,943,000
Total deposits: $20,895,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The First State Bank of Pineville does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The First State Bank of Pineville, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The First State Bank of Pineville will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-18

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.