The Greenburgh Savings Bank

New York – Westchester – Dobbs Ferry

(SB) Savings banks, state charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SB) Savings banks, state charter

inactive

16000

1869

FDIC Certificate Number: 16000
FDIC's unique number: 10230
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: New York City

Federal Reserve ID Number: 54209
Report Date: 1982-03-31

Bank Charter Class: SB
The date of the last data update: 1995-09-14

1869-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Greenburgh Savings Bank.
1982-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Peoples Westchester Savings Bank in Tarrytown, New York.
1986-02-12 Moved bank headquarters from Dobbs Ferry, New York to Hawthorne, New York.
1986-06-13 Changed organization type to Stock Savings Bank.
1991-08-09 Acquired Larchmont Federal Savings And Loan Association in Larchmont, New York.
1993-12-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Fidelity Bank, National Association, New York in New York City, New York.
1994-05-12 Acquired The Savings Bank Of Rockland County in Spring Valley, New York.
1994-08-19 Acquired Mid-hudson Savings Bank Fsb in Fishkill, New York.
1994-10-20 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First Fidelity Bank, National Association in Salem, New Jersey.
1994-10-20 Changed name to First Fidelity Bank, National Association .
1994-10-20 Moved bank headquarters from New York City, New York to Newark, New Jersey.
1994-11-08 Moved bank headquarters from Newark, New Jersey to Elkton, Maryland.
1994-11-29 Acquired The Bank Of Baltimore in Baltimore, Maryland.
1994-12-30 Acquired First Fidelity Bank, Fsb in Beltsville, Maryland.
1996-01-01 Changed name to First Union National Bank .
1996-07-11 Moved bank headquarters from Elkton, Maryland to Avondale, Pennsylvania.
1998-01-16 Acquired Covenant Bank in Haddonfield, New Jersey.
1998-02-26 Moved bank headquarters from Avondale, Pennsylvania to Charlotte, North Carolina.
1998-02-26 Acquired First Union National Bank in Charlotte, North Carolina.
1998-02-27 Acquired Signet Trust Company in Richmond, Virginia.
1998-05-15 Acquired Corestates Bank, National Association in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania.
1998-08-13 Acquired Mentor Trust Company in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania.
1998-08-13 Acquired Mentor Trust Company in Richmond, Virginia.
1999-07-16 Acquired Keystone Trust Company in Portsmouth, New Hampshire.
1999-12-01 Acquired Meridian Trust Company in Reading, Pennsylvania.
2002-04-01 Changed name to Wachovia Bank, National Association .
2002-04-01 Acquired Wachovia Bank, National Association in Winston-salem, North Carolina.
2002-12-31 Acquired The First National Bank Of Atlanta in New Castle, Delaware.
2002-12-31 Acquired Offitbank in New York City, New York.
2003-11-06 Acquired Atlantic Savings Bank, F.S.B. in Hilton Head Island, South Carolina.
2004-12-01 Acquired First Union Direct Bank, National Association in Augusta, Georgia.
2005-01-03 Acquired Southtrust Bank in Birmingham, Alabama.
2006-03-01 Acquired Western Financial Bank, National Association in Irvine, California.
2007-10-12 Acquired World Savings Bank Interim, National Association in Oceanside, New York.
2008-06-01 Acquired A.g. Edwards Trust Company, Fsb in St. Louis, Missouri.
2010-03-20 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association in Sioux Falls, South Dakota.
2010-04-10 Acquired Wachovia Card Services, National Association in Atlanta, Georgia.
2010-05-10 Acquired Wells Fargo Hsbc Trade Bank, National Association in San Francisco, California.
2010-11-01 Acquired Wells Fargo Alaska Trust Company, National Association in Anchorage, Alaska.
2011-03-31 Acquired Wells Fargo Central Bank in Calabasas, California.

Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The Greenburgh Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The Greenburgh Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Greenburgh Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-333

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.