The Home Builders Association

Ohio – Highland – Lynchburg

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter

inactive

29767

1922

FDIC Certificate Number: 29767
FDIC's unique number: 42601
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Columbus

Federal Reserve ID Number: 354477
Report Date: 2011-03-31

Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 2011-04-07

1922-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Home Builders Association.
1996-03-22 Changed name to The Home Builders Association .
2011-04-05 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Southern Hills Community Bank in Leesburg, Ohio.
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Office Of Thrift Supervision to Comptroller Of The Currency.

Total assets: $26,277,000
Total deposits: $20,231,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

No affiliations

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The Home Builders Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The Home Builders Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Home Builders Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

Please leave your Comment & Rating

Cancel
     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-97

All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.